OH HB361 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-09 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-09 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.246 of the Revised Code to designate March 29 as "Ohio Tuskegee Airmen Day."
Title
Designate Ohio Tuskegee Airmen Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-08 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-08 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-12-08 | House | Passed |
2020-12-08 | House | Reported - Substitute: State and Local Government |
2019-10-09 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2019-10-08 | House | Introduced |