OH HB347 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 56-37)
Status: Passed on November 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-02 - Effective 11/2/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To enact sections 5534.401, 5534.402, 5534.404, 5534.405, 5534.481, 5534.492, 5534.493, 5534.751, 5534.77, 5534.809, 5534.815, 5534.85, 5534.891, 5534.892, 5534.893, 5534.894, and 5534.895 of the Revised Code to designate multiple memorial highways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate Sonny L. Kim Memorial Highway

Sponsors

Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Jonathan Dever [R]Rep. Niraj Antani [R]Rep. Nickie Antonio [D]
Rep. Michael Ashford [D]Rep. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. John Boccieri [D]Rep. Thomas Brinkman [R]
Rep. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. David Leland [D]
Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]Rep. Alicia Reece [D]Rep. Wes Retherford [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]
Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]
Rep. Martin Sweeney [D]Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Doug Green [R]
Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Larry Householder [R]Rep. Terry Johnson [R]
Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Nathan Manning [R]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]Rep. John Barnes [D]
Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]Rep. Andrew Brenner [R]Rep. Richard Brown [D]
Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]Rep. Kathleen Clyde [D]Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]
Rep. Keith Faber [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Theresa Gavarone [R]
Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Christina Hagan [R]Rep. Michael Henne [R]Rep. Brian Hill [R]
Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Bernadine Kent [D]Rep. Al Landis [R]
Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. Sarah LaTourette [R]Rep. Scott Lipps [R]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]
Rep. Eugene Miller [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]
Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Marilyn Slaby [R]
Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Rep. Ron Young [R]
Rep. Paul Zeltwanger [R]Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]Sen. Edna Brown [D]Sen. Frank LaRose [R]
Sen. Gayle Manning [R]Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]
Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. William Coley [R]
Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. Randall Gardner [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]
Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Sen. Robert McColley [R]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]
Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Jason Wilson [D]
Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-02 Effective 11/2/18
2018-06-27HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2018-06-27SenatePassed
2018-06-27SenateReported - Substitute: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2018-06-19SenateRecommitted: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2018-06-06SenateReported: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2018-03-21SenateRefer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced
2018-03-07HousePassed
2017-12-14HouseReported: Transportation and Public Safety
2017-10-10HouseRefer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
2017-09-19HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
55New CodeSee Bill Text
5534New CodeSee Bill Text
5534401New CodeSee Bill Text
5534402New CodeSee Bill Text
5534404New CodeSee Bill Text
5534405New CodeSee Bill Text
5534481New CodeSee Bill Text
5534492New CodeSee Bill Text
5534493New CodeSee Bill Text
5534751New CodeSee Bill Text
553477New CodeSee Bill Text
5534809New CodeSee Bill Text
5534815New CodeSee Bill Text
553485New CodeSee Bill Text
5534891New CodeSee Bill Text
5534892New CodeSee Bill Text
5534893New CodeSee Bill Text
5534894New CodeSee Bill Text
5534895New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA132-HB-347
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb347/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb347/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb347/PH/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb347/RS/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb347/RCS/04?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb347/RRS/05?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb347/PS/06?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb347/EN/07?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA132-HB-347

Bill Comments

feedback