OH HB347 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 122.12, 122.121, 505.60, and 731.09 and to enact section 731.091 of the Revised Code to authorize the legislative authority of a statutory nonchartered village to be composed of five instead of six members and to authorize the terms of office to be nonstaggered, to restrict the types of competitive events that qualify for state grants based on projected incremental increases in sales tax receipts, and to authorize townships to reimburse officers and employees for out-of-pocket insurance premiums attributable to coverage provided for their immediate dependents.
Title
To authorize the legislative authority of a statutory nonchartered village to be composed of five instead of six members and to authorize the terms of office to be nonstaggered, to restrict the types of competitive events that qualify for state grants based on projected incremental increases in sales tax receipts, and to authorize townships to reimburse officers and employees for out-of-pocket insurance premiums attributable to coverage provided for their immediate dependents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-12 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | Effective Date | |
2012-12-20 | Governor' Action | |
2012-12-27 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-12-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-12-12 | Concurrence | |
2012-12-11 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-12-06 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-03-15 | To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs | |
2012-03-15 | Introduced to Senate | |
2012-03-14 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-02-15 | Committee Report | |
2011-10-18 | To Local Government | |
2011-10-18 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 22 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 22 | 121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
5 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
5 | 05 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
7 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
7 | 31 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 31 | 091 | New Code | See Bill Text |