OH HB341 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 19 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-27 - Speaker Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 149.43, 149.45, 319.28, 2101.024, and 2301.03 of the Revised Code to include judges and magistrates as individuals whose residential and familial information is exempt from disclosure under the Public Records Law, and whose addresses public offices, upon request, must redact from records available to the general public on the internet; to allow spouses whose residential and familial information is not a public record to, under an existing procedure, remove their names from the county auditor's public internet records and the general tax list and duplicate, and to instead insert their initials; to change the name of the "domestic relations-juvenile-probate division" of the Logan County Court of Common Pleas to the "family court division"; to specify the administrative judge of the family court division is the clerk of the family court division; and to remove the requirement that the common pleas court clerk keep all of the journals, records, books, papers, and files pertaining to the domestic relations cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempt personal information about judges from disclosure

Sponsors

Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Rep. Jack Cera [D]Rep. John Becker [R]Rep. James Butler [R]
Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Rep. Scott Lipps [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Sen. Bill Reineke [R]
Rep. Wes Retherford [R]Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]
Rep. John Boccieri [D]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]
Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Rep. Alicia Reece [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]
Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]Rep. Steven Arndt [R]
Rep. Michael Ashford [D]Rep. John Barnes [D]Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]
Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Keith Faber [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]
Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]
Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Rep. Al Landis [R]Rep. Sarah LaTourette [R]Rep. David Leland [D]
Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]Rep. Eugene Miller [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]
Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Dorothy Pelanda [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]
Sen. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]
Rep. Dick Stein [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Rep. Ron Young [R]Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]
Sen. William Coley [R]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. John Eklund [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]
Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]
Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]
Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Jason Wilson [D]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2018-12-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-27HouseSpeaker Signed
2018-12-27HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2018-12-19SenatePassed
2018-11-28SenateReported - Substitute: Judiciary
2018-02-28SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced
2018-01-31HousePassed
2017-12-07HouseReported - Amended: Government Accountability and Oversight
2017-09-19HouseRefer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight
2017-09-11HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
149Amended CodeCitation Text
14943Amended CodeCitation Text
14945Amended CodeCitation Text
21Amended CodeCitation Text
2101Amended CodeCitation Text
2101024Amended CodeCitation Text
23Amended CodeCitation Text
2301Amended CodeCitation Text
230103Amended CodeCitation Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
319Amended CodeCitation Text
31928Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback