OH HB338 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-18 - Effective 8/31/22 - Operating appropriations effective June 1, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-18 - Effective 8/31/22 - Operating appropriations effective June 1, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 306.37, 4501.025, 4501.13, 4506.06, 4506.09, 4507.112, 4507.24,4508.08, and 5517.011 and to enact sections 306.354 and 5501.441 of the Revised Code and to amend Section 223.15 of S.B. 310 of the 133rd General Assembly as subsequently amended to make changes to the laws related to the Bureau of Motor Vehicles, regional transit authorities, toll violations between states, the financial contracting authority of the Director of Transportation for purposes of the Brent Spence Bridge Project, and to make an appropriation.
Title
Revise motorcycle safety and education program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Effective 8/31/22 - Operating appropriations effective June 1, 2022 | |
2022-05-18 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Passed |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Transportation |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-12-09 | House | Passed |
2021-11-16 | House | Reported: Transportation and Public Safety |
2021-06-10 | House | Refer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety |
2021-06-07 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Education
Public Safety
Transportation
Transportation : Drivers' Licenses
Transportation : Highways, Roads, and Bridges
Transportation : Motor Vehicles
Transportation : Vehicle Registration and Titling
Public Safety
Transportation
Transportation : Drivers' Licenses
Transportation : Highways, Roads, and Bridges
Transportation : Motor Vehicles
Transportation : Vehicle Registration and Titling
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 06 | 354 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 06 | 37 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 01 | 025 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 01 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 06 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 06 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 07 | 112 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 07 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 01 | 441 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 17 | 011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |