OH HB332 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 59-27)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Effective 9/28/18 - Appropriations effective June 29, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 59-27)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Effective 9/28/18 - Appropriations effective June 29, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact sections 2108.36, 2108.37, and 2108.38 of the Revised Code regarding anatomical gifts, transplantation, and discrimination on the basis of disability and to make an appropriation.
Title
Regards anatomical gifts, transplants, and discrimination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | Effective 9/28/18 - Appropriations effective June 29, 2018 | |
2018-06-07 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Passed |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-24 | House | Passed |
2017-11-29 | House | Reported: Health |
2017-09-12 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2017-08-30 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
21 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
21 | 08 | 36 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 08 | 37 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 08 | 38 | New Code | See Bill Text |