OH HB328 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-09 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-09 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 3737.52 of the Revised Code to prohibit the use of class B firefighting foam containing intentionally added PFAS chemicals for testing and training purposes.
Title
Prohibit class B firefighting foam containing PFAS chemicals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-12-08 | House | Passed |
2020-12-02 | House | Reported - Substitute: Commerce and Labor |
2019-09-24 | House | Refer to Committee: Commerce and Labor |
2019-09-03 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Environment and Natural Resources
Environment and Natural Resources : Air and Water Pollution Control
Health and Human Services : Public Health
State and Local Government : Local Government
State and Local Government : State Government
Environment and Natural Resources : Air and Water Pollution Control
Health and Human Services : Public Health
State and Local Government : Local Government
State and Local Government : State Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
37 | 37 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 37 | 52 | New Code | See Bill Text |