OH HB325 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-13)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Refer to Committee: General Government and Agency Review
Pending: Senate General Government and Agency Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 5.293 of the Revised Code to designate February 18 as "Toni Morrison Day."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate Toni Morrison Day-February 18

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 84 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-20SenateRefer to Committee: General Government and Agency Review
2020-02-24SenateIntroduced
2020-02-20HousePassed
2020-01-30HouseReported: State and Local Government
2019-09-24HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2019-08-28HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback