OH HB318 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Informally passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Informally passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 4723.01, 4729.01, 4760.01, 4760.08, 4760.09, 4760.16, and 4761.17 of the Revised Code to revise the law governing the practice of anesthesiologist assistants.
Title
Revise law governing anesthesiologist assistants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-14 | House | Informally passed |
2022-12-12 | House | Informally passed |
2022-12-01 | House | Informally passed |
2022-06-01 | House | Reported - Substitute: Health |
2021-05-25 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2021-05-19 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 23 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 29 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 60 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 60 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 60 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 60 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 61 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |