OH HB317 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Effective 9/28/16 - Some provisions effective March 28, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Effective 9/28/16 - Some provisions effective March 28, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 149.43, 149.45, and 1349.52 and to enact section 1349.521 of the Revised Code to enable the parents or guardian of a protected consumer to freeze that consumer's credit to protect the consumer from identity theft.
Title
Allows parent or guardian to freeze protected consumer's credit
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Maag [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Effective 9/28/16 - Some provisions effective March 28, 2017 | |
2016-05-24 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Passed |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Financial Institutions |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Financial Institutions |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-02-17 | House | Passed |
2015-12-09 | House | Reported - Substitute: Financial Institutions, Housing, and Urban Development |
2015-10-01 | House | Refer to Committee: Financial Institutions, Housing, and Urban Development |
2015-09-02 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 49 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 49 | 43 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 49 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
13 | 49 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
13 | 49 | 52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 49 | 521 | New Code | See Bill Text |