OH HB302 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Introduced on June 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-15 - Reported - Substitute: Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-15 - Reported - Substitute: Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 2903.41 of the Revised Code to include certain child abuse-related offenses in the violent offender database, to name the act Jacob's Law, and to make an appropriation.
Title
Include child abuse-related offenses in violent offender database
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | House | Reported - Substitute: Finance |
2020-11-17 | House | Re-referred: Finance |
2020-11-12 | House | Re-referred: Rules and Reference |
2019-06-30 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2019-06-26 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Juvenile and Family Law
Juvenile and Family Law : Child Welfare
Public Safety
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Juvenile and Family Law
Juvenile and Family Law : Child Welfare
Public Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 03 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |