OH HB300 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 27 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-27 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 4507.50 and 4507.52 of the Revised Code to provide that any nondriver identification card that is issued to a resident of Ohio who is permanently or irreversibly disabled must be issued with an 8-year expiration date and to exempt such cardholders who are also unemployed from the identification card fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specify disabled person's state ID card does not expire

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-27HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2018-12-27HouseThe question being, Shall the amendments be concurred in?
2018-12-27SenatePassed
2018-12-04SenateReported - Amended: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2018-02-28SenateRefer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced
2018-01-31HousePassed
2017-11-30HouseReported - Substitute: State and Local Government
2017-09-12HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2017-06-29HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4507Amended CodeCitation Text
450750Amended CodeCitation Text
450752Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback