OH HB30 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Refer to Committee: Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 4511.216, 4513.11, 4513.17, and 5733.98; to enact new section 4513.111 and sections 4513.112, 4513.113, 4513.114, and 4513.115; and to repeal sections 4513.111 and 5733.44 of the Revised Code to clarify the law governing slow-moving vehicles and to revise the lighting and reflective material requirements applicable to animal-drawn vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise law re: slow-moving and animal-drawn vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21SenateRefer to Committee: Transportation
2021-04-20SenateIntroduced
2021-04-15HousePassed - Amended
2021-03-10HouseReported - Substitute: Transportation and Public Safety
2021-02-04HouseRefer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
2021-02-03HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4511216Amended CodeCitation Text
451311Amended CodeCitation Text
4513111Repealed CodeCitation Text
451317Amended CodeCitation Text
573344Repealed CodeCitation Text
573398Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-30
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb30/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb30/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb30/PH/02?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15544&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15812&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15943&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16003&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16321&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16410&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-30

Bill Comments 750

feedback