OH HB29 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 24 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Conference managers: Sens. - Schuring, Manning, Thomas: Conference Committee on H.B. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 109.32, 109.572, 317.24, 317.241, 718.031, 718.08, 2915.01, 2915.08, 2915.081, 2915.082, 2915.09, 2915.091, 2915.093, 2915.095, 2915.10, 2915.101, 2915.12, 2915.13, 3123.89, 3123.90, 3770.071, 3770.073, 3772.01, 3772.02, 3772.03, 3772.062, 3772.07, 5703.21, 5747.02, 5747.062, 5747.063, 5747.08, 5747.20, 5751.01, 5753.01, 5753.03, 5753.04, 5753.05, 5753.06, 5753.061, 5753.07, 5753.08, and 5753.10 and to enact sections 2915.14, 2915.15, 3376.01, 3376.02, 3376.03, 3376.04, 3376.05, 3376.06, 3376.07, 3376.08, 3772.37, 3775.01, 3775.02, 3775.03, 3775.04, 3775.041, 3775.05, 3775.051, 3775.06, 3775.07, 3775.08, 3775.09, 3775.10, 3775.101, 3775.11, 3775.12, 3775.13, 3775.14, 3775.15, 3775.16, 3775.17, 3775.99, 5753.021, and 5753.031 of the Revised Code to allow a person who was discharged from the United States Public Health Service or the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration to obtain an Ohio veterans identification card, to allow intercollegiate athletes to earn compensation from their name, image, or likeness, to legalize and regulate sports gaming in this state, to levy a tax on businesses that provide sports gaming, and to make other changes to the Gambling Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permit certain persons to obtain Ohio veterans ID card

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-28 - House - House Failed (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-06SenateConference managers: Sens. - Schuring, Manning, Thomas: Conference Committee on H.B. 29
2021-10-06HouseConference managers: Reps. - Edwards, Seitz, Miller, A.
2021-09-21SenateInsist on amendments; asks for committee of conference
2021-06-28HouseRefused to concur in Senate amendments
2021-06-24SenatePassed - Amended
2021-06-24SenateInformally passed
2021-06-02SenateReported: Veterans and Public Safety
2021-03-17SenateRefer to Committee: Veterans and Public Safety
2021-03-10HousePassed
2021-03-04HouseReported: Armed Services and Veterans Affairs
2021-02-04HouseRefer to Committee: Armed Services and Veterans Affairs
2021-02-03HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10932Amended CodeCitation Text
109572Amended CodeCitation Text
291501Amended CodeCitation Text
291508Amended CodeCitation Text
2915081Amended CodeCitation Text
2915082Amended CodeCitation Text
291509Amended CodeCitation Text
2915091Amended CodeCitation Text
2915093Amended CodeCitation Text
2915095Amended CodeCitation Text
291510Amended CodeCitation Text
2915101Amended CodeCitation Text
291512Amended CodeCitation Text
291513Amended CodeCitation Text
291514New CodeSee Bill Text
291515New CodeSee Bill Text
31724Amended CodeCitation Text
317241Amended CodeCitation Text
312389Amended CodeCitation Text
312390Amended CodeCitation Text
337601New CodeSee Bill Text
337602New CodeSee Bill Text
337603New CodeSee Bill Text
337604New CodeSee Bill Text
337605New CodeSee Bill Text
337606New CodeSee Bill Text
337607New CodeSee Bill Text
337608New CodeSee Bill Text
3770071Amended CodeCitation Text
3770073Amended CodeCitation Text
377201Amended CodeCitation Text
377202Amended CodeCitation Text
377203Amended CodeCitation Text
3772062Amended CodeCitation Text
377207Amended CodeCitation Text
377237New CodeSee Bill Text
377501New CodeSee Bill Text
377502New CodeSee Bill Text
377503New CodeSee Bill Text
377504New CodeSee Bill Text
3775041New CodeSee Bill Text
377505New CodeSee Bill Text
3775051New CodeSee Bill Text
377506New CodeSee Bill Text
377507New CodeSee Bill Text
377508New CodeSee Bill Text
377509New CodeSee Bill Text
377510New CodeSee Bill Text
3775101New CodeSee Bill Text
377511New CodeSee Bill Text
377512New CodeSee Bill Text
377513New CodeSee Bill Text
377514New CodeSee Bill Text
377515New CodeSee Bill Text
377516New CodeSee Bill Text
377517New CodeSee Bill Text
377599New CodeSee Bill Text
570321Amended CodeCitation Text
574702Amended CodeCitation Text
5747062Amended CodeCitation Text
5747063Amended CodeCitation Text
574708Amended CodeCitation Text
574720Amended CodeCitation Text
575101Amended CodeCitation Text
575301Amended CodeCitation Text
5753021New CodeSee Bill Text
575303Amended CodeCitation Text
5753031New CodeSee Bill Text
575304Amended CodeCitation Text
575305Amended CodeCitation Text
575306Amended CodeCitation Text
5753061Amended CodeCitation Text
575307Amended CodeCitation Text
575308Amended CodeCitation Text
575310Amended CodeCitation Text
718031Amended CodeCitation Text
71808Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-29
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb29/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb29/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb29/PH/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb29/RS/03/hb29_03_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb29/PS/04/hb29_04_PS?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15632&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15797&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15862&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15872&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16089&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16090&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16889&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16910&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16918&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17227&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17213&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17318&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-29

Bill Comments

feedback