OH HB277 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-17)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-16 - Reported - Amended: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-16 - Reported - Amended: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 2933.81 of the Revised Code to revise the law governing the electronic recording of custodial interrogations.
Title
Revise law about electronic recording of custodial interrogations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-16 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-02-20 | House | Passed |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported - Substitute: Criminal Justice |
2019-06-18 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2019-06-06 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Juvenile and Family Law : Juvenile Justice
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Juvenile and Family Law : Juvenile Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 33 | 81 | Amended Code | Citation Text |