OH HB276 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 7 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-07 - Manually Generate Message Element
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 7 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-07 - Manually Generate Message Element
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 4734.15 of the Revised Code to authorize chiropractors to engage in certain activities involving nutrition-related items and therapies, nonprescription drugs, and medical goods and devices.
Title
Revises the scope of practice for chiropractors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-07 | Senate | Manually Generate Message Element |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Passed |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Reported: State and Local Government |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-05-11 | House | Passed |
2016-04-20 | House | Reported - Substitute: Health and Aging |
2015-10-01 | House | Refer to Committee: Health and Aging |
2015-06-24 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 34 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |