OH HB274 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 5301.057 of the Revised Code to provide that a transfer fee for purposes of a transfer fee covenant does not include any payment required pursuant to a conservation easement or agricultural easement, to authorize the conveyance of the water rights of certain state-owned real estate to the Wayne County Board of County Commissioners, and to authorize the conveyance of state-owned real estate in Richland County to the Mansfield Reformatory Preservation Society.
Title
To provide that a transfer fee for purposes of a transfer fee covenant does not include any payment required pursuant to a conservation easement or agricultural easement, to authorize the conveyance of the water rights of certain state-owned real estate to the Wayne County Board of County Commissioners, and to authorize the conveyance of state-owned real estate in Richland County to the Mansfield Reformatory Preservation Society.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | Effective Date | |
2012-12-20 | Governor' Action | |
2012-12-31 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-12-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-12-13 | Concurrence | |
2012-12-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-12-12 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-11-28 | To Judiciary | |
2012-11-28 | Introduced to Senate | |
2012-11-27 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-05-16 | Committee Report | |
2011-06-21 | To Judiciary & Ethics | |
2011-06-21 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
53 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
53 | 01 | 057 | Amended Code | Citation Text |