OH HB272 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-13)
Status: Passed on December 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-16 - Effective 12/16/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-13)
Status: Passed on December 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-16 - Effective 12/16/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 2307.382 and to enact sections 9.57 and 3501.40 of the Revised Code to expand the basis of a court's exercise of personal jurisdiction to include any basis consistent with the Ohio Constitution and the United States Constitution, to prohibit a public official from ordering the closure of all places of worship in a geographic area, and to prohibit a public official from changing the time, place, or manner of conducting an election, except in certain circumstances.
Title
Expand court jurisdiction to any constitutional basis
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-16 | Effective 12/16/20 | |
2020-09-01 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2020-08-31 | House | Amendments laid over under the rule |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Passed - Amended |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Reported: Judiciary |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-13 | House | Passed |
2019-10-17 | House | Reported: Civil Justice |
2019-06-05 | House | Refer to Committee: Civil Justice |
2019-06-04 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
23 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
23 | 07 | 382 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 01 | 40 | New Code | See Bill Text |