OH HB264 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Referred to committee: Energy and Public Utilities
Pending: Senate Energy and Public Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Referred to committee: Energy and Public Utilities
Pending: Senate Energy and Public Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 4928.01 of the Revised Code to make certain steam-producing facilities waste energy recovery systems for purposes of the state's energy efficiency laws.
Title
Make certain steam-producing facilities waste energy recovery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | Senate | Referred to committee: Energy and Public Utilities |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-05-08 | House | Passed |
2023-12-13 | House | Reported: Energy and Natural Resources |
2023-09-26 | House | Referred to committee: Energy and Natural Resources |
2023-09-12 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
House Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Senate Energy and Public Utilities Committee
Utilities : Electric Utilities
Senate Energy and Public Utilities Committee
Utilities : Electric Utilities
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 28 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |