OH HB26 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-8)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-13 - Referred to committee: Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-13 - Referred to committee: Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5534.485 of the Revised Code to designate a portion of State Route 301 in Wayne County as the "Town and Country Firefighter Lt. Philip M. Wigal Memorial Highway."
Title
Designate Town and Country Firefighter Lt. Philip M. Wigal Hwy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-13 | Senate | Referred to committee: Transportation |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-12-06 | House | Passed |
2023-03-01 | House | Reported: Transportation |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to committee: Transportation |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
House Transportation Committee
Public Safety
Senate Transportation Committee
Special Designations
Special Designations : Memorial Highways and Bridges
Transportation
Public Safety
Senate Transportation Committee
Special Designations
Special Designations : Memorial Highways and Bridges
Transportation