OH HB256 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-21)
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-06 - Referred to committee: Health
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-06 - Referred to committee: Health
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2108.05 and 2108.33 and to enact section 2108.231 of the Revised Code to require the Department of Natural Resources to inquire about organ donation under specified circumstances.
Title
Require ODNR to inquire about organ donation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-11-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-06 | Senate | Referred to committee: Health |
2023-12-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-11-29 | House | Passed |
2023-11-15 | House | Reported - Amended: Public Health Policy |
2023-09-12 | House | Referred to committee: Public Health Policy |
2023-08-16 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Environment and Natural Resources
Environment and Natural Resources : Hunting and Fishing
Health and Human Services : Public Health
House Public Health Policy Committee
Public Safety
Senate Health Committee
Transportation : Vehicle Registration and Titling
Environment and Natural Resources : Hunting and Fishing
Health and Human Services : Public Health
House Public Health Policy Committee
Public Safety
Senate Health Committee
Transportation : Vehicle Registration and Titling
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 08 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 08 | 231 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 08 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |