OH HB255 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-13)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-28 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-28 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 5721.03 of the Revised Code to permit the second publication of a county delinquent property tax list to be made online instead of in a newspaper.
Title
Permit second delinquent property tax publication online
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-22 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2021-09-23 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-09-22 | House | Passed |
2021-06-15 | House | Reported: Ways and Means |
2021-04-15 | House | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2021-04-14 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | 21 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |