OH HB250 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-20 - Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
Pending: Senate Transportation, Commerce and Workforce Committee
Hearing: Mar 21 @ 10:15 am in South Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]


To amend sections 4501.01, 4509.01, 4511.01, 4511.051, 4511.132, 4511.27, 4511.39, 4511.40, 4511.52, 4511.53, 4511.54, 4511.55, 4511.56, 4511.68, and 4511.711 and to enact section 4511.522 of the Revised Code to establish requirements for the use of electric bicycles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Establish requirements for using electric bicycles


Roll Calls

2018-01-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2018-02-20SenateRefer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2017-12-14HouseReported - Substitute: Transportation and Public Safety
2017-06-06HouseRefer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4501Amended CodeCitation Text
450101Amended CodeCitation Text
4509Amended CodeCitation Text
450901Amended CodeCitation Text
4511Amended CodeCitation Text
451101Amended CodeCitation Text
4511051Amended CodeCitation Text
4511132Amended CodeCitation Text
451127Amended CodeCitation Text
451139Amended CodeCitation Text
451140Amended CodeCitation Text
451152Amended CodeCitation Text
4511522New CodeSee Bill Text
451153Amended CodeCitation Text
451154Amended CodeCitation Text
451155Amended CodeCitation Text
451156Amended CodeCitation Text
451168Amended CodeCitation Text
4511711Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

Bill Comments