OH HB239 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-10 - Reported - Re-referred to Finance: Rules and Reference
Pending: House Rules and Reference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-10 - Reported - Re-referred to Finance: Rules and Reference
Pending: House Rules and Reference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 3335.38 of the Revised Code with regard to the Ohio State University's Farm Financial Management Institute and to make an appropriation.
Title
Regards OSU's Farm Financial Management Institute
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | House | Reported - Re-referred to Finance: Rules and Reference |
2021-06-08 | House | Reported - Re-referred to Rules and Reference: Agriculture and Conservation |
2021-04-14 | House | Refer to Committee: Agriculture and Conservation |
2021-03-31 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 35 | 38 | Amended Code | Citation Text |