OH HB239 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-19)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-05 - Committee Report - S
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-05 - Committee Report - S
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 5747.01 of the Revised Code to exempt retirement pay related to service in the Commissioned Corps of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration and the Commissioned Corps of the Public Health Service.
Title
To exempt retirement pay related to service in the Commissioned Corps of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration and the Commissioned Corps of the Public Health Service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-05 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-05-10 | To Ways & Means & Economic Development | |
2012-05-10 | Introduced to Senate | |
2012-05-09 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-04-25 | Committee Report | |
2011-05-24 | To Health & Aging | |
2011-05-24 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 47 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |