OH HB23 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 42-26)
Status: Enrolled on December 7 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-13 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 7 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-13 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 4765.16 and 5503.01 and to enact sections 109.7410 and 4765.162 of the Revised Code to require emergency medical service personnel and peace officers to undergo dementia-related training and to increase the maximum allowable age for new state highway patrol troopers.
Title
Require EMS / peace officers to undergo dementia-related training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-13 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Passed |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Veterans and Public Safety |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Veterans and Public Safety |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported - Amended: Commerce and Labor |
2021-02-04 | House | Refer to Committee: Commerce and Labor |
2021-02-03 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Health and Human Services : Aging
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Public Safety
Health and Human Services : Aging
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Public Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 09 | 7410 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 65 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 65 | 162 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 03 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |