OH HB23 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-03 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-03 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 131.44, 1509.73, 5741.01, 5741.03, and 5741.032 of the Revised Code to use one-half of any income from oil and gas leases on state land to fund temporary income tax reductions, to modify the law governing the use of new Ohio use tax collections from remote sellers for income tax reductions, and to require the Director of Budget and Management to recommend whether or not income tax rates should be permanently reduced after the Director certifies a temporary rate reduction resulting from the accrual of money in the Income Tax Reduction Fund.
Title
Reduces income taxes
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Amstutz [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 78 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-05-27 | House | Passed |
2015-05-13 | House | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2015-02-10 | House | To committee: Ways and Means |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 31 | 44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
15 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
15 | 09 | 73 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 41 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 41 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 41 | 032 | Amended Code | Citation Text |