OH HB228 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 718.01, 718.80, 718.81, 718.83, 718.85, 718.90, and 5703.77 and to enact section 718.841 of the Revised Code to make changes related to the state administration of municipal net profits taxes and the municipal taxation of retirement benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards state-administered municipal net profits taxes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-02SenateRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2021-05-26HousePassed
2021-05-19HouseReported - Substitute: Ways and Means
2021-03-24HouseRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2021-03-23HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
570377Amended CodeCitation Text
71801Amended CodeCitation Text
71880Amended CodeCitation Text
71881Amended CodeCitation Text
71883Amended CodeCitation Text
718841New CodeSee Bill Text
71885Amended CodeCitation Text
71890Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-228
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb228/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb228/RH/01/hb228_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb228/PH/02/hb228_02_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16276&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16331&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16718&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16797&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16814&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16882&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16915&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-228

Bill Comments 750

feedback