OH HB227 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 44-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-23 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 311.42, 1547.69, 2923.12, 2923.121, 2923.122, 2923.123, 2923.125, 2923.126, 2923.128, 2923.1210, 2923.1213, and 2923.16 of the Revised Code to generally extend the firearm possession provisions that apply to a concealed handgun licensee to also apply to a person who is age 21 or older and not prohibited by Ohio or federal law from possessing a firearm without need for the person obtaining a license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards concealed weapons and concealed carry without license

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-23SenateIntroduced
2021-11-17HousePassed
2021-11-01HouseReported - Substitute: Government Oversight
2021-03-24HouseRefer to Committee: Government Oversight
2021-03-23HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
154769Amended CodeCitation Text
292312Amended CodeCitation Text
2923121Amended CodeCitation Text
29231210Amended CodeCitation Text
29231213Amended CodeCitation Text
2923122Amended CodeCitation Text
2923123Amended CodeCitation Text
2923125Amended CodeCitation Text
2923126Amended CodeCitation Text
2923128Amended CodeCitation Text
292316Amended CodeCitation Text
31142Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-227
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb227/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb227/RH/01/hb227_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb227/PH/02/hb227_02_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16289&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16759&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16790&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16904&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17703&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17770&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17843&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17886&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-227

Bill Comments

feedback