OH HB226 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-6)
Status: Engrossed on November 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-17 - Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
Pending: Senate Transportation, Commerce and Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-17 - Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
Pending: Senate Transportation, Commerce and Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 4511.62, 4511.63, 4511.64, and 4511.712 of the Revised Code to require vehicle operators to watch, listen, and stop for on-track equipment that may be approaching a railroad crossing.
Title
Require vehicle operators check for on-track railroad equipment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-17 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2019-11-26 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-20 | House | Passed |
2019-11-20 | House | Reported: Transportation and Public Safety |
2019-05-08 | House | Refer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety |
2019-04-29 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 11 | 62 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 63 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 64 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 712 | Amended Code | Citation Text |