OH HB220 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-09 - Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
Pending: Senate Transportation, Commerce and Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-09 - Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
Pending: Senate Transportation, Commerce and Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 9.16 of the Revised Code to allow a governmental entity to utilize distributed ledger technology, including blockchain technology.
Title
Permit government to utilize distributed ledger tech/blockchain
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-09 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-12-02 | House | Passed |
2019-06-13 | House | Reported - Amended: Commerce and Labor |
2019-04-30 | House | Refer to Committee: Commerce and Labor |
2019-04-24 | House | Introduced |