OH HB194 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-02 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-02 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 109.572, 718.031, 3770.01, 3770.02, 3770.03, 3770.99, 3772.03, 5703.21, 5747.02, 5747.063, 5747.064, 5747.08, 5747.20, 5751.01, 5753.01, 5753.03, 5753.04, 5753.05, 5753.06, 5753.061, 5753.07, 5753.08, and 5753.10 and to enact sections 3770.30, 3770.31, 3770.32, 3770.33, 3770.331, 3770.34, 3770.35, 3770.36, 3770.37, 3770.38, 3770.39, 3770.40, 5753.021, and 5753.031 of the Revised Code to legalize and regulate sports gaming in this state, to levy a tax on businesses that provide sports gaming, to create a Sports Gaming Advisory Board, and to require the State Lottery Commission to make certain lottery games available in Ohio.
Title
Legalize and regulate sports gaming/tax sports gaming businesses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-05-28 | House | Passed |
2020-05-28 | House | Reported - Substitute: Finance |
2019-04-10 | House | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2019-04-09 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 09 | 572 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 70 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 70 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 70 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 70 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 70 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 70 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 70 | 32 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 70 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 70 | 331 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 70 | 34 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 70 | 35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 70 | 36 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 70 | 37 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 70 | 38 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 70 | 39 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 70 | 40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 70 | 99 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 72 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 72 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 03 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 47 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | 063 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | 064 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 51 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 53 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 53 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 53 | 021 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 53 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 53 | 031 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 53 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 53 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 53 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 53 | 061 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 53 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 53 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 53 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
7 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
7 | 18 | 031 | Amended Code | Citation Text |