OH HB186 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Referred to committee: Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Referred to committee: Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 5739.01, 5739.02, 5739.03, and 5739.17 of the Revised Code to exempt from sales and use tax sales of firearm safety devices.
Title
Exempt sales of firearm safety devices from sales and use tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-14 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | House | Referred to committee: Ways and Means |
2023-05-24 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | 39 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 39 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 39 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 39 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |