OH HB172 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-10 - Reported - Substitute: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-10 - Reported - Substitute: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 1345.022, 4513.601, 4513.62, 5322.01, 5322.02, and 5322.03 and to enact sections 4505.104, 4513.602, and 4513.603 of the Revised Code to amend the law regarding self-service storage facilities, unsafe tires, and towing.
Title
Regards self-service storage facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Passed (Y: 62 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Passed (Y: 62 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed - Amended |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported: Civil Justice |
2019-04-02 | House | Refer to Committee: Civil Justice |
2019-03-27 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Commerce
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Public Safety
Transportation : Motor Vehicles
Transportation : Vehicle Equipment
Transportation : Vehicle Registration and Titling
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Public Safety
Transportation : Motor Vehicles
Transportation : Vehicle Equipment
Transportation : Vehicle Registration and Titling
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 45 | 022 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 05 | 104 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 13 | 601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 13 | 602 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 13 | 603 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 13 | 62 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
53 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
53 | 22 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | 22 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | 22 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |