OH HB17 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-04 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 323.151, 323.152, 323.153, 4503.064, 4503.065, and 4503.066 of the Revised Code to allow an enhanced homestead exemption for surviving spouses of public safety personnel killed in the line of duty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhance homestead exemption-spouse of killed safety officer

Sponsors

Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. John Becker [R]Rep. Gil Blair [D]
Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. James Butler [R]
Rep. Jamie Callender [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Jack Cera [D]
Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]
Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]
Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Diane Grendell [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]
Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]
Rep. Don Jones [R]Sen. Kris Jordan [R]Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]
Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. George Lang [R]Rep. David Leland [D]
Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Scott Lipps [R]Rep. Beth Liston [D]
Rep. Don Manning [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]
Rep. Joe Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]
Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]
Rep. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Phil Robinson [D]
Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]
Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Michael Skindell [D]
Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Todd Smith [R]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Jason Stephens [R]
Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]Rep. D. J. Swearingen [R]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]Rep. Emilia Strong Sykes [D]
Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]
Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]

Roll Calls

2019-11-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-04SenateRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2019-11-26SenateIntroduced
2019-11-19HousePassed
2019-11-13HouseReported - Amended: Ways and Means
2019-02-13HouseRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
323Amended CodeCitation Text
323151Amended CodeCitation Text
323152Amended CodeCitation Text
323153Amended CodeCitation Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4503Amended CodeCitation Text
4503064Amended CodeCitation Text
4503065Amended CodeCitation Text
4503066Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback