OH HB167 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 28 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To provide rent and utility assistance and to make an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide rent and utility assistance

Sponsors

Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]
Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]Rep. Jon Cross [R]
Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Alessandro Cutrona [R]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]
Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]
Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Larry Householder [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]
Rep. Dontavius Jarrells [D]Rep. Marilyn John [R]Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]
Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]
Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Mike Loychik [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joseph Miller [D]
Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Phillip Robinson [D]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]
Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Monique Smith [D]
Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]Rep. Daniel Troy [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]
Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Andrea White [R]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]
Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]
Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]
Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Tina Maharath [D]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]
Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]
Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28SenatePassed
2021-04-28SenateReported: Finance
2021-04-21SenateRefer to Committee: Finance
2021-04-20SenateIntroduced
2021-04-15HousePassed
2021-04-15HouseReported - Amended: Finance
2021-03-03HouseRefer to Committee: Finance
2021-03-02HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-167
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb167/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb167/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb167/PH/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb167/RS/03?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb167/PS/04?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb167/EN/05?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15903&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15950&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16292&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16301&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16335&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16381&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16447&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16450&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-167

Bill Comments 750

feedback