OH HB167 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 46-11)
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-28 - Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Medicaid Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-28 - Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Medicaid Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 4723.52, 4730.56, 4731.83, and 5119.363, to amend, for the purpose of adopting a new section number as indicated in parentheses, section 3715.08 (3719.064), and to enact sections 3719.063 and 4729.283 of the Revised Code regarding naltrexone and medication-assisted treatment.
Title
Address opioid prescribing and addiction treatment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2018-11-19 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-11-14 | House | Passed |
2018-07-02 | House | Reported - Substitute: Health |
2017-05-01 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2017-03-28 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 15 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 19 | 063 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 15 | 302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 15 | 303 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 23 | 52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 29 | 283 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 29 | 75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 29 | 77 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 29 | 79 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 30 | 56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 31 | 052 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 31 | 055 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 31 | 058 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 31 | 059 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 31 | 83 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
51 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
51 | 19 | 363 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 19 | 373 | New Code | See Bill Text |