OH HB165 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-13)
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-23 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 5747.98 and 5751.98 and to enact sections 122.078, 5747.74, and 5751.55 of the Revised Code to temporarily authorize a nonrefundable tax credit for the retail sale of high-ethanol blend motor fuel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow temporary tax credit for sale of certain motor fuel

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-23SenateIntroduced
2021-11-17HousePassed
2021-06-23HouseReported - Substitute: Ways and Means
2021-03-03HouseRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2021-03-02HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
122078New CodeSee Bill Text
574774New CodeSee Bill Text
574798Amended CodeCitation Text
575155New CodeSee Bill Text
575198Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-165
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb165/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb165/RH/01/hb165_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb165/PH/02/hb165_02_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16010&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16127&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17260&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17250&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17907&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-165

Bill Comments

feedback