OH HB163 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - Refer to Committee: Energy and Public Utilities
Pending: Senate Energy and Public Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - Refer to Committee: Energy and Public Utilities
Pending: Senate Energy and Public Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 5747.50, 5747.51, and 5747.53 and to enact sections 9.662, 743.80, and 5747.504 of the Revised Code to create a process for withholding local government funds and state water and sewer assistance from municipal corporations that engage in certain water and sewer practices with respect to extraterritorial service.
Title
Withhold funds-municipal water/sewer extraterritorial practices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Energy and Public Utilities |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-06-10 | House | Passed |
2020-05-19 | House | Reported - Substitute: Public Utilities |
2019-04-02 | House | Refer to Committee: Public Utilities |
2019-03-25 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Finance and Appropriations
State and Local Government : Local Government
Utilities
Utilities : Water Utilities
State and Local Government : Local Government
Utilities
Utilities : Water Utilities
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 47 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | 504 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 47 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | 53 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
7 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
7 | 43 | 80 | New Code | See Bill Text |