OH HB153 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-09 - Effective 9/9/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-09 - Effective 9/9/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3501.01, 3513.01, and 3513.12 of the Revised Code to change the date on which presidential primary elections are held.
Title
Changes data of presidential primary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Passed (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Passed (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-09 | Effective 9/9/15 | |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Reported: State and Local Government |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported - Amended: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2015-04-14 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2015-04-13 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
35 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
35 | 01 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
35 | 13 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 13 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |