OH HB135 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 49-30)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-20 - To Ways & Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-20 - To Ways & Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 5725.98, 5726.98, 5729.98, 5747.98, and 5749.11 and to enact sections 122.177, 5725.35, 5726.58, 5729.18, 5747.78, 5749.18, and 5749.98 of the Revised Code to authorize a nonrefundable credit against the income tax and certain business taxes for the rehabilitation of a vacant industrial site.
Title
To authorize a nonrefundable credit against the income tax and certain business taxes for the rehabilitation of a vacant industrial site.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-19 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | To Ways & Means | |
2013-06-20 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-06-19 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-06-12 | Committee Report - A | |
2013-04-17 | To Economic Development and Regulatory Reform | |
2013-04-17 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
1 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 22 | 177 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 25 | 35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 25 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 26 | 58 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 26 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 29 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 29 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 47 | 78 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 47 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 49 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 49 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 49 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 49 | 98 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 51 | 55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 51 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |