OH HB132 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Enrolled on June 24 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-25 - Insist on amendments; asks for committee of conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 24 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-25 - Insist on amendments; asks for committee of conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 5322.01, 5322.02, and 5322.03 of the Revised Code to amend the law regarding self-service storage facilities.
Title
Revise law re: self-service storage facilities and towing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-28 - House - House Failed (Y: 1 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | Senate | Insist on amendments; asks for committee of conference |
2021-06-28 | House | Refused to concur in Senate amendments |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Passed - Amended |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Transportation |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed |
2021-03-10 | House | Reported - Amended: Civil Justice |
2021-02-24 | House | Refer to Committee: Civil Justice |
2021-02-17 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Commerce
Public Safety
Transportation
Transportation : Motor Vehicles
Transportation : Traffic Offenses
Transportation : Vehicle Registration and Titling
Public Safety
Transportation
Transportation : Motor Vehicles
Transportation : Traffic Offenses
Transportation : Vehicle Registration and Titling
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | 22 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | 22 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | 22 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |