OH HB128 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 46-11)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective 6/30/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 3706.40, 3706.41, 3706.43, 3706.45, 3706.46, 3706.49, 3706.55, 3706.59, 4928.143, 4928.642, and 4928.645; to enact sections 3706.491, 3706.551, and 4906.105; and to repeal sections 3706.53, 3706.61, 4928.471, and 5727.231 of the Revised Code to make changes regarding electric utility service law, to repeal certain provisions of, and limit to solar resources the credit payment provisions of, H.B. 6 of the 133rd General Assembly, and to provide refunds to retail electric customers in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise electric utility service law; repeal portions of HB 6

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30 Effective 6/30/21
2021-03-25HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2021-03-24SenatePassed
2021-03-24SenateReported - Amended: Energy and Public Utilities
2021-03-17SenateRefer to Committee: Energy and Public Utilities
2021-03-16SenateIntroduced
2021-03-10HousePassed
2021-03-10HouseReported - Substitute: Public Utilities
2021-02-17HouseRefer to Committee: Public Utilities
2021-02-16HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
370640Repealed CodeCitation Text
370641Repealed CodeCitation Text
370643Repealed CodeCitation Text
370645Repealed CodeCitation Text
370646Repealed CodeCitation Text
370649Repealed CodeCitation Text
3706491New CodeSee Bill Text
370653Repealed CodeCitation Text
370655Repealed CodeCitation Text
3706551New CodeSee Bill Text
370659Repealed CodeCitation Text
370661Repealed CodeCitation Text
4906105New CodeSee Bill Text
4928143Amended CodeCitation Text
4928471Repealed CodeCitation Text
4928642Repealed CodeCitation Text
4928645Amended CodeCitation Text
5727231Repealed CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-128
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb128/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb128/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb128/PH/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb128/RS/03?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb128/PS/04?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb128/EN/05?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb128/EN/05/hb128_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15709&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15830&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15962&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15966&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15999&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16007&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16156&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16164&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16172&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16196&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16243&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16379&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-128

Bill Comments 750

feedback