OH HB120 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 70-16)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Effective 7/21/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 3721.20 of the Revised Code regarding compassionate care visits in long-term care facilities during an epidemic, pandemic, or other state of emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permit compassionate care visits in long-term care facilities

Sponsors

Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Cindy Abrams [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]
Rep. Adam Bird [R]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]
Rep. Gary Click [R]Rep. Rodney Creech [R]Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]
Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Sarah Fowler Arthur [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]
Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Diane Grendell [R]Rep. Jennifer Gross [R]
Rep. Thomas Hall [R]Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]
Rep. Larry Householder [R]Rep. Marilyn John [R]Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Kris Jordan [R]
Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Brian Lampton [R]
Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Scott Lipps [R]Rep. Beth Liston [D]
Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Derek Merrin [R]Rep. Joseph Miller [D]
Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Gail Pavliga [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]
Rep. Sharon Ray [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]
Rep. Jean Schmidt [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Monique Smith [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]
Rep. Brian Stewart [R]Rep. D. J. Swearingen [R]Rep. Daniel Troy [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]
Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Andrea White [R]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]
Rep. Bob Young [R]Rep. Tom Young [R]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]
Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]
Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]
Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. George Lang [R]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]
Sen. Robert McColley [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]
Sen. Michael Rulli [R]Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]Sen. Kirk Schuring [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]
Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-06 Effective 7/21/22
2022-04-06HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2022-04-06SenatePassed
2022-04-06SenateReported - Substitute: Health
2021-04-21SenateRefer to Committee: Health
2021-03-25HousePassed
2021-03-23HouseReported: Families, Aging, and Human Services
2021-02-17HouseRefer to Committee: Families, Aging, and Human Services
2021-02-16HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
372120New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-120
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb120/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb120/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb120/PH/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb120/RS/03/hb120_03_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb120/PS/04/hb120_04_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb120/EN/05/hb120_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15858&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15976&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16094&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16163&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16209&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16385&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18888&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18879&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18877&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18884&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18900&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18921&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18941&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-120

Bill Comments

feedback