OH HB114 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 51-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Refer to Committee: Energy and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 4928.01, 4928.142, 4928.143, 4928.20, 4928.61, 4928.62, 4928.64, 4928.641, 4928.643, 4928.644, 4928.645, 4928.65, 4928.66, 4928.662, 4928.6610, 4928.6611, and 5727.75 and to enact sections 4928.647, 4928.664, 4928.665, 4928.666, 4928.667, 4928.6620, and 4928.6621 of the Revised Code and to amend Section 257.80 of Am. Sub. H.B. 64 of the 132nd General Assembly and to repeal Sections 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, and 11 of Sub. S.B. 310 of the 130th General Assembly to revise the provisions governing renewable energy, energy efficiency, and peak demand reduction and to alter funding allocations under the Home Energy Assistance Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise energy efficiency provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 65 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26SenateRefer to Committee: Energy and Natural Resources
2017-04-05SenateIntroduced
2017-03-30HousePassed
2017-03-30HouseReported - Substitute: Public Utilities
2017-03-14HouseRefer to Committee: Public Utilities
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
49Amended CodeCitation Text
4928Amended CodeCitation Text
492801Amended CodeCitation Text
4928031New CodeSee Bill Text
4928142Amended CodeCitation Text
4928143Amended CodeCitation Text
492820Amended CodeCitation Text
492861Amended CodeCitation Text
492862Amended CodeCitation Text
492864Amended CodeCitation Text
4928641Amended CodeCitation Text
4928643Amended CodeCitation Text
4928644Amended CodeCitation Text
4928645Amended CodeCitation Text
4928647New CodeSee Bill Text
492865Amended CodeCitation Text
492866Amended CodeCitation Text
49286610Amended CodeCitation Text
49286611Amended CodeCitation Text
4928662Amended CodeCitation Text
49286620New CodeSee Bill Text
49286621New CodeSee Bill Text
4928664New CodeSee Bill Text
4928665New CodeSee Bill Text
4928666New CodeSee Bill Text
4928667New CodeSee Bill Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5727Amended CodeCitation Text
572775Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback