OH HB111 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-16)
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2903.215, 2919.25, and 2929.14 of the Revised Code to increase the sentencing range for third degree felony domestic violence and to create a presumption in favor of a prison term for the offense.
Title
Increase sentence range for third degree felony domestic violence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to committee: Judiciary |
2023-12-19 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-12-13 | House | Passed |
2023-10-11 | House | Reported - Amended: Criminal Justice |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred to committee: Criminal Justice |
2023-03-14 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
House Criminal Justice Committee
Senate Judiciary Committee
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
House Criminal Justice Committee
Senate Judiciary Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 03 | 215 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |