OH HB1 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-17 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-17 - Effective Date
Summary
Title
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-17 | Effective Date | |
2009-07-17 | Governor' Action | |
2009-07-28 | End of 10-day period | |
2009-07-16 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-07-13 | Concurrence | |
2009-06-10 | Conference Committee | |
2009-06-03 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2009-06-02 | Committee Report - Substitute | |
2009-04-30 | To Finance & Financial Institutions | |
2009-04-30 | Introduced to Senate | |
2009-04-29 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2009-04-28 | Committee Report - Substitute | |
2009-02-12 | To Finance & Appropriations | |
2009-02-12 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=128_HB_1 |