NY S65014 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends certain provisions of the New York state financial emergency act for the city of New York and the New York city charter in relation to bond anticipation notes.
Title
Amends certain provisions of the New York state financial emergency act for the city of New York and the New York city charter in relation to bond anticipation notes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-29 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
S4941 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.185
A8617 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.185
S60415 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S50005 (Same As) 2009-06-23 - PASSED SENATE
A8617 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.185
S60415 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S50005 (Same As) 2009-06-23 - PASSED SENATE