NY S50003 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the reorganization of the New York city school construction authority, board of education and community boards.
Title
Relates to the reorganization of the New York city school construction authority, board of education and community boards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-23 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
S60403 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65003 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65109 (Same As) 2009-06-30 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65113 (Same As) 2009-07-01 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65003 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65109 (Same As) 2009-06-30 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65113 (Same As) 2009-07-01 - REFERRED TO RULES