NY S09422 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-05 - SIGNED CHAP.375
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-05 - SIGNED CHAP.375
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "utility thermal energy network and jobs act" to promote the development of thermal energy networks throughout the state and to provide jobs to transitioning utility workers who have lost or are at risk of losing their employment.
Title
Establishes the "utility thermal energy network and jobs act" to promote the development of thermal energy networks throughout the state and to provide jobs to transitioning utility workers who have lost or are at risk of losing their employment.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Neil Breslin [D] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Mario Mattera [R] | Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-05 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.375 |
2022-06-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.662 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a10493 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1824 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10493 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9422